Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Yenny García

Bishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1972 Born
19 Mar 199624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tampico, Tamaulipas, México
19 Mar 202048.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
17 Jun 202048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Roberto Yenny García
Bishop Roberto Yenny García (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Valles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Valles, Diocese of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Valles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 12 Apr 2020
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast