Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guadalupe Antonio Ruíz Urquín

Prelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1971 Born
19 Mar 199725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
27 Jun 202049.1AppointedPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México
24 Sep 202049.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Guadalupe Antonio Ruíz Urquín
Bishop Guadalupe Antonio Ruíz Urquín (born ) Prelate of Huautla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTapilula, Diocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Huautla de Jiménez, Territorial Prelature of Huautla, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Huautla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2020
  • bp: CB, 27 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 11 Aug 2020
  • c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Sep 2020

Quantcast