Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan Manuel González Sandoval, M.N.M.

Bishop-Elect of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1964 Born
7 Sep 199026.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
2 Jul 199127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
4 Feb 201752.9AppointedBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
1 Apr 201753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
2 Apr 201753.1InstalledBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel González Sandoval
Father Juan Manuel González Sandoval M.N.M. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tarahumara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuáscuaro
Ordained BishopBarrancas del Cobre

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tarahumara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 14 Feb 2017
  • i: CB, 27 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017