Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William John Cardinal Conway

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh

Cardinal-Priest of San Patrizio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1913BornBelfast
20 Jun 193724.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 195845.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland
31 May 195845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
27 Jul 195845.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neve (Nebo)
9 Sep 196350.6AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
22 Feb 196552.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196552.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Patrizio
17 Apr 197764.2DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William John Conway:
Cardinal William John Conway (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013