Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Mar 1893 | Born | ||
28 Apr 1918 | 25.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Derry, Ireland |
5 Aug 1939 | 46.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Derry, Ireland |
1 Oct 1939 | 46.5 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Derry, Ireland |
13 Apr 1973 | 80.0 | Retired | Bishop of Derry, Ireland |
7 May 1980 | 87.1 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland |
(VIAF: 88789181; WikiData: Q26242997)
Bishop
Neil
Farren
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Derry
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Buncrana |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠