Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cahal Brendan Cardinal Daly

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh

Cardinal-Priest of San Patrizio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1917BornLoughguile
22 Jun 194123.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 196749.7AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
16 Jul 196749.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
24 Aug 198264.9AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Nov 199073.1AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
28 Jun 199173.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199173.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Patrizio
1 Oct 199679.0RetiredArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
31 Dec 200992.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Cahal Brendan Daly:
Cahal Brendan Cardinal Daly (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Armagh

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Sep 2014