Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)

Eparchia Sanctae Familiae Londiniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • Elevated: 18 January 2013
  • Ukrainian Catholic Church of the Byzantine Tradition
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Mailing Address: Ukrainian Cathedral House, 22 Binney Street, London, W1K 5BQ, England, Great Britain
  • Telephone: (020)7629.1073
  • Fax: 7355.3314

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian)
10 June 1957ErectedApostolic Exarchate of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
12 May 1968Name ChangedApostolic Exarchate of England and Wales {Inghilterra e Galles} (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
18 January 2013ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Great Britain (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
19691341704711ap1971
197825,00093122,0833513ap1981
199027,000133161,6873414ap1991
199915,000122141,0712514ap2000
200015,000122141,0712414ap2001
200115,000123151,0003414ap2002
200215,000123151,0003414ap2003
200910,000125175885112ap2010
Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
201310,130113147233112ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013