Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeronim Isidore Chimy, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1919Born
27 Jul 194122.3Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
29 Jun 194425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Jun 197455.2AppointedBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
5 Sep 197455.4Ordained BishopBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
19 Sep 199273.5DiedBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Jeronim Isidore Chimy
Bishop Jeronim Isidore Chimy O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of New Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadway

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • c1/sole: CB, 12 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Mar 2018