Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Beahen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Ploaghe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1922Born
15 Jun 194624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
11 May 197755.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
11 May 197755.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ploaghe
21 Jun 197755.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ploaghe
14 Mar 198866.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Michael Beahen
Bishop John Michael Beahen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast