Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Francis Pappin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Aradi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1928Born
27 May 195425.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 197546.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
29 Jan 197546.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
11 Apr 197546.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi
27 Aug 199870.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bernard Francis Pappin
Bishop Bernard Francis Pappin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestmeath
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Sudbury

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast