Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Adolphe Proulx

Deceased

Bishop of Gatineau-Hull, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1927Born
27 May 195426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
2 Jan 196537.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
2 Jan 196537.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Missua
24 Feb 196537.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missua
28 Apr 196739.3AppointedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
16 Jun 196739.5InstalledBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
13 Feb 197446.1AppointedBishop of Hull, Québec, Canada
30 Mar 197446.2InstalledBishop of Hull, Québec, Canada
22 Jul 198759.6DiedBishop of Gatineau-Hull, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Adolphe Proulx (VIAF: 31156467)
Bishop Joseph Adolphe Proulx (born , died ) Bishop of Gatineau-Hull

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHanmer
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame de l’Assomption, Pro-Cathedral, North Bay, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Assomption, Pro-Cathedral, North Bay, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario
Death PlaceLancaster
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cemetery, Hull, Diocese of Gatineau-Hull, Québec

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc: CB, 12 Apr 2019
  • fn: CB, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 May 2019

Quantcast