Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Attila Miklósházy, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Castellum Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1931Born
1 Jan 195220.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
18 Jun 196130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 196635.3Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Aug 198958.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
4 Nov 198958.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
28 Dec 201887.7DiedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus

MicroData Summary for Attila Miklósházy (VIAF: 74092457)
Bishop Attila Miklósházy S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Castellum Minus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiósgyor, Hungary
Ordained BishopSt. Michael, Cathedral, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
Death PlacePickering, Ontario

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,672
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast