Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Christopher Cody

Deceased

Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1899Born
26 May 192323.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 193636.9AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
25 Feb 193737.1Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
6 Apr 194646.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
6 Apr 194646.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elatea
2 Jun 195050.4SucceededBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
5 Dec 196363.9DiedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Christopher Cody
Bishop John Christopher Cody (born , died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast