Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Battaglia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1890BornBrembate Sopra
25 Jul 191424.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 194353.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Faenza, Italy
21 Aug 194353.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
10 Oct 194353.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
17 Dec 194454.7SucceededBishop of Faenza, Italy
31 Aug 197686.4RetiredBishop of Faenza, Italy
19 Nov 198494.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Battaglia:
Bishop Giuseppe Battaglia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faenza

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015