Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Testa

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1909Born
6 Dec 193122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
18 Jun 195344.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
18 Jun 195344.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
26 Aug 195344.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
195949.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
29 Sep 196253.4DiedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Testa (VIAF: 89661955)
Archbishop Giacomo Testa (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCenate Sotto

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast