Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Bondini

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1891Born
25 Jul 191423.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 195059.1AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
16 Apr 195059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
28 Jan 195967.9DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Bondini
Bishop Mario Bondini (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Diocese of Forli

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,950, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast