Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvano Montevecchi

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1938Born
16 Jun 196224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
30 Aug 199759.4AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
4 Oct 199759.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
25 Oct 199759.5InstalledBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
27 Sep 201375.4DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvano Montevecchi
Bishop Silvano Montevecchi (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla San Giorgio in Vezzano, Brisighella, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana
Death PlaceMontecatone, Imola, Diocese of Imola
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,153
  • d: CB, 28 Sep 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast