Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benigno Carrara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1888BornSerina
23 Apr 191122.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 194759.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Imola, Italy
20 Dec 194759.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
1 Feb 194859.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
12 May 195667.4SucceededBishop of Imola, Italy
12 Mar 197485.2RetiredBishop of Imola, Italy
27 Jul 197485.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benigno Carrara:
Bishop Benigno Carrara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013