Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Théophile Louis Marie Madec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1923BornPloemel
5 Apr 194724.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 198359.9AppointedBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
10 Apr 198360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
16 May 200077.2RetiredBishop of Fréjus-Toulon, France
5 Feb 201389.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Théophile Louis Marie Madec:
Bishop Joseph Théophile Louis Marie Madec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus-Toulon

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013