Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Paul Arulswamy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1916Born
24 Aug 194427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kumbakonam, India
5 May 195538.6AppointedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
21 Sep 195539.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbakonam, India
16 Aug 198871.9ResignedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
12 Oct 200387.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam, India

MicroData Summary for Daniel Paul Arulswamy
Bishop Daniel Paul Arulswamy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViragalur

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 83
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast