Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rajarethinam Arokiasamy Sundaram

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tanjore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1905Born
24 Feb 194135.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 195347.6AppointedBishop of Tanjore, India
19 Mar 195347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tanjore, India
12 Sep 198681.2RetiredBishop of Tanjore, India
28 Aug 199893.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tanjore, India

MicroData Summary for Rajarethinam Arokiasamy Sundaram
Bishop Rajarethinam Arokiasamy Sundaram (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tanjore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMegathur

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast