Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Amaducci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1924Born
5 Apr 194723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Forli, Italy
28 May 197753.2AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 May 197753.2AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
18 Jun 197753.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
10 Jul 197753.3InstalledBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 Aug 197753.4InstalledBishop of Sarsina, Italy
30 Sep 198662.5AppointedBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
27 Oct 199066.6AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
6 Dec 199066.7InstalledArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
9 Mar 200076.0RetiredArchbishop of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy
3 May 201086.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Amaducci
Archbishop Luigi Amaducci (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna-Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pancrazio di Russi, Diocese of Forli
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Forli, Diocese of Forli
Death PlaceCesena, Diocese of Cesena-Sarsina
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Traversara di Bagnacavallo, Diocese of Faenza-Modigliana
Buried Place (Current)Crypt, Cathedral, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna-Cervia

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,060
  • c1/i/loc: AM, 25 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast