Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tarcisio Bertozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1928Born
9 Sep 195123.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 198254.2AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
6 Aug 198254.2AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
18 Sep 198254.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
30 Sep 198658.3AppointedBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
16 May 199668.0DiedBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tarcisio Bertozzi
Bishop Francesco Tarcisio Bertozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza-Modigliana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGambettola

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast