Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Charles de Vesc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
6 Sep 152520.6AppointedBishop of Agde, France
10 May 153126.3AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
1536²31.0ResignedBishop of Valence and Die, France
28 Apr 153631.3AppointedBishop of Castres, France
1551¹46.0ResignedBishop of Castres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Charles de Vesc
Bishop Antoine-Charles de Vesc (born 1505) Bishop Emeritus of Castres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97, and Page 326
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast