Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Edouard-François Gueullette

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1808BornMoulins
19 Dec 183022.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 186456.9SelectedBishop of Valence, France
27 Mar 186557.2ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
7 May 186557.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
7 Jan 187567.0ResignedBishop of Valence, France
18 Mar 189183.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Edouard-François Gueullette:
Bishop Nicolas-Edouard-François Gueullette (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valence

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013