Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désiré Marie Hippolyte Paget

Deceased

Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1860Born
1882²21.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sens (-Auxerre), France
22 Apr 192060.2AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
29 Jun 192060.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
8 Jul 192060.4InstalledBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
11 Jan 193272.0DiedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Désiré Marie Hippolyte Paget
Bishop Désiré Marie Hippolyte Paget (born , died ) Bishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChailley

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast