Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Jacques de Gelas de Léberon

Deceased

Bishop of Valence and Die


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
22 May 162331.3AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
2 Feb 162432.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valence and Die, France
5 Jun 165462.4DiedBishop of Valence and Die, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Jacques de Gelas de Léberon:
Bishop Charles-Jacques de Gelas de Léberon (died ) Bishop of Valence and Die

  • a bishop for 30.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 21 Mar 2015