Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aymar de La Voulte

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers (Aps), France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1326AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
22 Aug 1331AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
24 Jan 1337AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
1365²DiedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aymar de La Voulte
Bishop Aymar de La Voulte (died 1365) Bishop of Viviers (Aps)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 533, and Page 513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast