Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amedeo Cardinal di Saluzzo

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1361¹BornSavoy
4 Nov 138322.8AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
23 Dec 138323.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 138323.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
15 Jun 138827.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Valence and Die, France
28 Jun 141958.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Amedeo di Saluzzo:
Cardinal Amedeo di Saluzzo (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

  • a cardinal for 35.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013