Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Marie Kinam Ro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1902BornRon Tjai
26 Oct 193027.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 194239.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
10 Nov 194239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Colbasa
20 Dec 194239.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colbasa
10 Mar 196259.2AppointedArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
23 Mar 196764.2ResignedArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
23 Mar 196764.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tituli in Proconsulari
10 Mar 197168.2ResignedTitular Archbishop of Tituli in Proconsulari
25 Jun 198481.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Marie Kinam Ro:
Archbishop Paul Marie Kinam Ro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015