Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kang U-il

Bishop of Cheju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1945 Born
9 Dec 197429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
21 Dec 198540.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
21 Dec 198540.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
14 Feb 198640.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
20 Jul 200256.7AppointedBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Peter Kang U-il
Bishop Peter Kang U-il (born ) Bishop of Cheju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cheju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Aug 2017