Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lee Han-taek, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Uijongbu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1934 BornAnsong
9 Jun 197136.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Nov 200167.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
19 Nov 200167.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
25 Jan 200267.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
5 Jul 200469.6AppointedBishop of Uijongbu, Korea (South)
26 Feb 201075.2RetiredBishop of Uijongbu, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lee Han-taek:
Bishop Joseph Lee Han-taek S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Uijongbu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uijongbu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013