Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedictus Son Hee-Song

Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

Titular Bishop of Camplum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1957 BornKyenki Yeonchenun Chadari
4 Jul 198629.4Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
14 Jul 201558.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
14 Jul 201558.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Camplum
28 Aug 201558.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camplum

MicroData Summary for Benedictus Son Hee-Song:
Bishop Benedictus Son Hee-Song (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Seoul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 28 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015