Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Yu Gyoung-chon

Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

Titular Bishop of Puppi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1962 BornJung-gu, Jungrim-dong
30 Jan 199229.4Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
30 Dec 201351.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
30 Dec 201351.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
5 Feb 201451.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi

MicroData Summary for Timothy Yu Gyoung-chon:
Bishop Timothy Yu Gyoung-chon (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Seoul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 1 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014