Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy Bruguière, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1792BornRaissac d'Aude, France
23 Dec 181523.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
5 Feb 182836.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
5 Feb 182836.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
29 Jun 182937.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
9 Sep 183139.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
20 Oct 183543.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy Bruguière:
Bishop Barthélemy Bruguière M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013