Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien-Joseph Larribeau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Thinis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1883Born
10 Mar 190724.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Dec 192643.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
23 Dec 192643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
1 May 192744.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa
22 Jan 193349.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
5 Jan 194258.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
4 Jul 195875.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Daijeon, Korea (South)
10 Mar 196279.0AppointedBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
6 Nov 196380.7RetiredBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
6 Nov 196380.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinis
12 Aug 197491.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Adrien-Joseph Larribeau
Bishop Adrien-Joseph Larribeau M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Daejeon {Taejon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Romieu, France

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 21
  • fn: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018