Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Cho Kyu-man

Bishop of Wonju


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1955 BornPochon
26 Aug 198227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
3 Jan 200650.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
3 Jan 200650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
25 Jan 200650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
31 Mar 201660.8AppointedBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Basil Cho Kyu-man
Bishop Basil Cho Kyu-man (born ) Bishop of Wonju

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wonju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,047
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016