Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Chung Soon-taek, O.C.D.

Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Tamazuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1961 Born
25 Jan 199230.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
16 Jul 199230.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
30 Dec 201352.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
30 Dec 201352.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamazuca
5 Feb 201452.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamazuca

MicroData Summary for Peter Chung Soon-taek
Bishop Peter Chung Soon-taek O.C.D. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Seoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaegu

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Seoul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 1 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast