Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of P’yŏng-yang

Dioecesis Pyeongyangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Hpyeng-yang
17 March 1927ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Hpyeng-yang (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Peng-yang
17 March 1929Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Hpyeng-yang Prefecture Apostolic of Peng-yang
Vicariate Apostolic of Heijo
11 July 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Peng-yang Vicariate Apostolic of Heijo
Vicariate Apostolic of Pyong-Yang
12 July 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Heijo Vicariate Apostolic of Pyong-Yang
Diocese of P’yŏng-yang
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pyong-Yang Diocese of P’yŏng-yang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of P’yŏng-yang
19632020059ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 2 Jul 2013