Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Choi Chang-mou

Archbishop Emeritus of Kwangju


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1936 BornMunsan
9 Jun 196326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
3 Feb 199457.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
3 Feb 199457.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
25 Mar 199457.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenpiscense
9 Feb 199962.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kwangju, Korea (South)
30 Nov 200064.2SucceededArchbishop of Kwangju, Korea (South)
25 Mar 201073.5ResignedArchbishop of Kwangju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Andreas Choi Chang-mou:
Archbishop Andreas Choi Chang-mou (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kwangju

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kwangju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,307
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014