Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicholas Cardinal Cheong Jin-Suk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1931Born
18 Mar 196129.2Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
25 Jun 197038.5AppointedBishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)
3 Oct 197038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}, Korea (South)
3 Apr 199866.3AppointedArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
6 Jun 199866.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of P’yŏng-yang, Korea (North)
29 Jun 199866.5InstalledArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
24 Mar 200674.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200674.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea
19 Nov 200674.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Immacolata di Lourdes a Boccea
10 May 201280.4RetiredArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
10 May 201280.4RetiredApostolic Administrator of P’yŏng-yang, Korea (North)
27 Apr 202189.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Cheong Jin-Suk (VIAF: 73744537)
Nicholas Cardinal Cheong Jin-Suk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul, Archdiocese of Seoul
Ordained PriestCathedral, Seoul, Archdiocese of Seoul
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Church, Ch’ongju, Diocese of Cheongju {Ch’ongju}
Death PlaceSt. Mary's, Hospital, Seoul, Archdiocese of Seoul

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 50.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2012
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 818
  • d: CB, 27 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast