Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Hoang Min Syeng

Deceased

Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1923Born
24 Mar 195127.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 196541.6AppointedBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
31 May 196541.8Ordained BishopBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
13 Feb 198460.5DiedBishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Peter Hoang Min Syeng
Bishop Peter Hoang Min Syeng (born , died ) Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKo-Yang

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast