Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Siméon-François Berneux, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1814Born
20 May 183723.0Ordained PriestPriest
1839¹24.6ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jul 185440.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
15 Jul 185440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
27 Dec 185440.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
8 Mar 186651.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea
6 Oct 1968Beatified
6 May 1984Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Siméon-François Berneux (VIAF: 897753)
Bishop St. Siméon-François Berneux M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau-du-Loir, France

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017