Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stephen Cardinal Kim Sou-hwan

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul

Cardinal-Priest of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1922BornTaegu
15 Sep 195129.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 196643.8AppointedBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
31 May 196644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
9 Apr 196845.9AppointedArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
28 Apr 196947.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196947.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle
3 Apr 199875.9RetiredArchbishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
16 Feb 200986.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Stephen Kim Sou-hwan:
Stephen Cardinal Kim Sou-hwan (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Seoul

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
  • a cardinal for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014