Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Clair Ridel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1830Born
19 Dec 185727.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Apr 186938.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
27 Apr 186938.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
5 Jun 187039.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
20 Jun 188453.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea

MicroData Summary for Félix-Clair Ridel (VIAF: 49297077)
Bishop Félix-Clair Ridel M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChantenay-sur-Loire, France
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 22
  • bd: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast