Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Xirón de Alvarado, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹BornLeón, Nicaragua
168216.0ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 May 172155.4AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
4 Oct 172256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
21 Jun 172458.4DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Xirón de Alvarado:
Bishop José Xirón de Alvarado O.P. (born 1666, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,467
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015