Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Núñez Sagredo, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1633AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
8 Jul 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
31 Mar 1639DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Fernando Núñez Sagredo:
Bishop Fernando Núñez Sagredo O.SS.T. (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,635
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 158, Number 1,001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015