Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo de Escobar, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
22 May 159267.3AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
26 Jul 159267.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
19 Mar 159368.2DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de Escobar
Bishop Jerónimo de Escobar O.S.A. (born 1525, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Felipe, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Death PlaceCadiz

  • a bishop for .6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,298
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 665
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast