Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Benito Garret y Arlovi, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665²BornAgramunt, Spain
28 Jun 170843.4SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
3 Oct 170843.7ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
16 Nov 171045.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
7 Oct 171651.7DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Benito Garret y Arlovi:
Bishop Juan Benito Garret y Arlovi O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015