Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustin de Hinojosa y Montalvo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²BornMadrid, Spain
12 Aug 163055.6AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
16 Sep 163055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
5 Jul 163156.5DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustin de Hinojosa y Montalvo:
Bishop Agustin de Hinojosa y Montalvo O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,406
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 153, Number 970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015